ghazi52
THINK TANK: CONSULTANT
- Mar 21, 2007
- 116,905
- 167,135
- Country of Origin
- Country of Residence
1st Chief of the RPAF
15 Aug 1947 - 17 Feb 1949
Air Vice Marshal A L A Perry-Keene
RAF
...........................................
2nd Chief of the RPAF
18 Feb 1949 - 6 May 1951
Air Vice Marshal R L Atcherley
RAF
.............................................................................
3rd Chief of the RPAF
7 May 1951 - 19 Jun 1955
Air Vice Marshal L W Cannon
RAF
15 Aug 1947 - 17 Feb 1949
Air Vice Marshal A L A Perry-Keene
RAF
...........................................
2nd Chief of the RPAF
18 Feb 1949 - 6 May 1951
Air Vice Marshal R L Atcherley
RAF
.............................................................................
3rd Chief of the RPAF
7 May 1951 - 19 Jun 1955
Air Vice Marshal L W Cannon
RAF
Last edited: